JALALABAD MUSLIM SOCIETY OF BANGLADESH

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Information on the charity's activities is not available.
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Coventry City
Governance
- 19 November 2009: Standard registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
ABDUS SHAHID | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Surab Ali | Trustee | 20 January 2014 |
|
|
||||
Abdul Matin | Trustee | 20 January 2014 |
|
|
||||
TAJHAR ALI | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
ABUL FAZAL MOHAMMED LATIFUL MASUD | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 May 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 32 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 32 days | |
Annual return | 31 May 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 397 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 397 days | |
Annual return | 31 May 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 763 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 763 days | |
Annual return | 31 May 2021 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1128 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2021 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1128 days | |
Annual return | 31 May 2020 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1493 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2020 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1493 days |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 21 MAY 1995 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION 28 OCTOBER 2009
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE SOCIETY SHALL BE FOR THE FOLLOWING CHARITABLE PURPOSE- 1.1 TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF SUNNI MUSLIMS - DEOBONDI LIVING IN COVENTRY BY THE TEACHING OF ARABIC AND BENGALI LANGUAGES. 1.2 TO ADVANCE THE ISLAMIC RELIGION AND WRITINGS OF IMAM ABU HANIFI WITH IN THE CITY OF COVENTRY FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC THROUGH THE HOLDING OF PRAYER MEETINGS, LECTURES AND PUBLIC CELEBRATION OF RELIGIOUS FESTIVALS 1.3 THE RELIEF OF FINANCIAL NEED AND SUFFERING AMONG VICTIMS OF NATURAL OR OTHER KINDS OF DISASTER IN THE FORM OF MONEY (OR OTHER MEANS DEEMED SUITABLE) FOR PERSONS, BODIES, ORGANISATIONS AND/ OR COUNTRIES AFFECTED
Area of benefit
COVENTRY
Contact information
- Address:
-
1 - 7 Freehold Street
Hillfields
Coventry
CV1 5BG
- Phone:
- 07916117803
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window