THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF HOLY CROSS, FELSTED

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Acts of public worship open to all. Provision of sacred space for personal reflection and contemplation. Pastoral work, including visiting the sick and bereaved. Teaching christianity through sermons, courses and small groups.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
Total income includes £500 from 1 government grant(s)
People

13 Trustee(s)
10 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityOne or more of the employees were formerly trustees
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Essex
Governance
- 26 October 2009: Previously excepted registration
- FELSTED PCC (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
13 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev Colin John Taylor | Chair | 18 July 2013 |
|
|||||
MATTHEW DAVID FERGUSON | Trustee | 23 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Karen Anne Mitchell | Trustee | 10 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
RUTH LILIAN QUILTER | Trustee | 04 May 2020 |
|
|
||||
MICHAEL JOHN CROUCH | Trustee | 04 May 2020 |
|
|
||||
GRAHAM EDWARD KELLY | Trustee | 16 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
RICHARD STEPHEN BAZLINTON | Trustee | 16 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
Matthew Adam Sweeting | Trustee | 16 April 2018 |
|
|||||
JONATHAN HEWINS TREDWELL | Trustee | 04 April 2016 |
|
|
||||
Dr JAMES MACKIN | Trustee | 18 July 2013 |
|
|
||||
Dr GORDON ANDERSON-TAYLOR | Trustee | 08 April 2013 |
|
|
||||
MICHAEL JOHN CAMPBELL | Trustee | 04 April 2011 |
|
|
||||
JILL OLIVE SMYLIE | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £119.67k | £121.26k | £111.23k | £87.15k | £65.16k | |
|
Total expenditure | £113.20k | £116.77k | £98.56k | £100.45k | £118.87k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £500 |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 17 July 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 17 July 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 17 July 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 17 July 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 14 April 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 14 April 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 06 May 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 06 May 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 09 June 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 09 June 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL POWERS MEASURE (1956) AS AMENDED AND CHURCH REPRESENTATION RULES
Charitable objects
Promoting in the ecclesiastical parish the whole mission of the Church.
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, LOCAL
Contact information
- Address:
-
Bayards
Jollyboys Lane North
Felsted
DUNMOW
CM6 3DU
- Phone:
- 07885 286436
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window