THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ALL SAINTS' LALEHAM

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We seek to:- 1). Offer worship and prayer to Almighty God that is totally honouring to Him; 2). Offer Christian teaching, fellowship and loving pastoral care to everyone; 3). Encourage all believers to use their spiritual and practical gifts in the service of God.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

14 Trustee(s)
72 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Other Charitable Activities
- Surrey
Governance
- 22 March 2010: Previously excepted registration
- ALL SAINTS' LALEHAM PCC (Working name)
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
14 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev ANDY SAVILLE | Chair | 01 July 2010 |
|
|
||||
Hannah Lawes | Trustee | 01 August 2024 |
|
|
||||
Judith Lawino Banya | Trustee | 28 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Robert Lawrence Gilbert | Trustee | 24 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Alastair Duncan | Trustee | 26 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Rev Jonathan Lawes | Trustee | 03 July 2021 |
|
|
||||
Joanne Smith | Trustee | 18 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Rev Elspeth Saville | Trustee | 18 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Deborah Bull | Trustee | 27 April 2017 |
|
|
||||
IAN HUNT | Trustee | 20 May 2013 |
|
|
||||
ALEXANDRA WREN | Trustee | 21 May 2012 |
|
|
||||
Rev IAN SMAILES | Trustee | 24 April 2008 |
|
|
||||
RICHARD ATTERTON | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
ROSALIND MARY SMAILES | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £290.35k | £294.73k | £316.67k | £306.97k | £315.59k | |
|
Total expenditure | £273.76k | £297.82k | £301.18k | £329.27k | £346.75k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 20 May 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 20 May 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 22 May 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 22 May 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 16 May 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 16 May 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 12 July 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 12 July 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 07 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 07 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL POWERS MEASURE (1956) AS AMENDED AND CHURCH REPRESENTATION RULES
Charitable objects
Promoting in the ecclesiastical parish the whole mission of the Church.
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, LOCAL.
Contact information
- Address:
-
All Saints Laleham Parish Office
The Broadway
Laleham
STAINES-UPON-THAMES
TW18 1RZ
- Phone:
- 01784 441160
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window