GRANTHAM BAPTIST CHURCH

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Grantham Baptist Church aims to make disciples and transform lives both in the church and in the community. Volunteers in the church serve many activities engaging both young and old from the cradle to the grave. There are outreaches to those who are disadvantaged through meals, advice for people in debt and a whole range of children's and youth activities.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

12 Trustee(s)
50 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Other Finance
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Lincolnshire
Governance
- 16 December 2009: Previously excepted registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
12 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Ruth Crawford | Trustee | 27 April 2025 |
|
|
||||||
Kevin Crawford | Trustee | 27 April 2025 |
|
|
||||||
Virginia Leverton | Trustee | 27 April 2025 |
|
|
||||||
Christopher John Thomas | Trustee | 27 April 2023 |
|
|
||||||
Rachel Megan Sanders | Trustee | 27 April 2023 |
|
|
||||||
Robert James McGibbon | Trustee | 01 January 2023 |
|
|
||||||
IAN LINDSAY WHITTLE | Trustee | 29 October 2020 |
|
|||||||
Moira Palmer | Trustee | 25 April 2019 |
|
|
||||||
Dr MALCOLM HEWITSON | Trustee | 25 April 2019 |
|
|
||||||
Christiana Abimbola Durodola | Trustee | 25 April 2019 |
|
|
||||||
Christopher Dove | Trustee | 27 April 2017 |
|
|
||||||
David Scott Lynn | Trustee |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £110.73k | £125.85k | £109.33k | £116.67k | £101.97k | |
|
Total expenditure | £120.32k | £123.32k | £91.73k | £120.76k | £82.32k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 17 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 31 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 12 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 12 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 13 July 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 13 July 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 15 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 15 September 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 30 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR |
31 December 2019
(These accounts |
30 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 02/07/2009 AS AMENDED ON 30/06/2011
Charitable objects
The principal purpose of the Church is the advancement of the Christian faith according to the principles of the Baptist denomination. The Church may also advance education and carry out other charitable purposes in the United Kingdom and/or other parts of the world.
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, LOCAL
Contact information
- Address:
-
Grantham Baptist Church
Wharf Road
GRANTHAM
Lincolnshire
NG31 6BA
- Phone:
- 01476576419
- Email:
- g.b.c_ad@outlook.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window