Accounts and annual returns BETHESDA BAPTIST CHURCH, ROGERSTONE

Charity number: 1132056
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2024 30 March 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2024 30 March 2025 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2023 16 April 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 16 April 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2022 23 May 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 23 May 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2021 21 November 2022 21 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 21 November 2022 21 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2020 23 December 2021 53 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020

(These accounts
have been qualified)

23 December 2021 53 days late Download Open in new window