Financial history BETHESDA BAPTIST CHURCH, ROGERSTONE

Charity number: 1132056
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023 31/12/2024
Total gross income £163.67k £147.26k £183.34k £188.27k £168.62k
Total expenditure £155.87k £159.53k £187.45k £162.18k £188.37k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A