BETHESDA BAPTIST CHURCH, ROGERSTONE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Furthering the Christian religion through public worship, prayer, bible study, communion of the Lord's Supper, evangelism and mission, giving and supporting pastoral care. Providing family support through toddler groups and luncheon facilities for older people. Supporting Christian Ministry and charitable social action in the UK and overseas.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2024
People

10 Trustee(s)
40 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Newport City
Governance
- 09 October 2009: Previously excepted registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
REV MARK THOMAS | Chair | 11 September 2013 |
|
|
||||
Elizabeth Freeman | Trustee | 06 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Elizabeth Jones | Trustee | 06 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Martyn Ryan | Trustee | 06 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Christopher Perkins | Trustee | 06 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Mary Finch | Trustee | 06 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
David Roger Goodall | Trustee | 06 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Douglas Arthur Radford | Trustee | 06 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Jason Baker | Trustee | 06 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Christopher James Lynbeck | Trustee | 20 May 2018 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | 31/12/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £163.67k | £147.26k | £183.34k | £188.27k | £168.62k | |
|
Total expenditure | £155.87k | £159.53k | £187.45k | £162.18k | £188.37k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2024 | 30 March 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2024 | 30 March 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 16 April 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 16 April 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 23 May 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 23 May 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 21 November 2022 | 21 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 21 November 2022 | 21 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 23 December 2021 | 53 days late | |
Accounts and TAR |
31 December 2020
(These accounts |
23 December 2021 | 53 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 16 SEPTEMBER 2009 AS AMENDED ON 29 MAR 2017
Charitable objects
The principal purpose of the Church is the advancement of the Christian faith according to the principles of the Baptist denomination. The Church may also advance education and carry out other charitable purposes in the United Kingdom and/or other parts of the world.
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED, IN PRACTICE, LOCAL
Contact information
- Address:
-
209 Manor Way
Risca
NEWPORT
Gwent
NP11 6AE
- Phone:
- 07546537402
- Email:
- dougradford@hotmail.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window