MOSQUES AND IMAMS NATIONAL ADVISORY BOARD

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The MINAB will provide an advisory and capacity-building role for member organisations to meet the standards through activities such as institutional mentoring, training programmes, helpline, development of toolkits and facilitation of workshops, seminars and conferences.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

7 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Other Defined Groups
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 06 May 2010: Standard registration
- MINAB (Working name)
- Paying staff
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||||||||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Qari Asim MBE | Chair | 30 June 2018 |
|
|
||||||||||||||||
YOUSIF ABUALQASSIM | Trustee | 31 December 2019 |
|
|
||||||||||||||||
Ali Albatati | Trustee | 30 June 2018 |
|
|
||||||||||||||||
Mohammed Imran Pir Abdali | Trustee | 30 June 2018 |
|
|
||||||||||||||||
Aksa Khan | Trustee | 30 June 2018 |
|
|
||||||||||||||||
MOIN AZMI | Trustee | 30 June 2018 |
|
|||||||||||||||||
Dr SYED NAQVI | Trustee | 30 June 2018 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £5.50k | £5.30k | £5.20k | £5.52k | £5.25k | |
|
Total expenditure | £500 | £200 | £150 | £3.55k | £3.30k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 13 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 31 December 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 12 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 05 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 29 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 10 APR 2009 AS AMENDED 25 APRIL 2010
Charitable objects
1. ASSIST IN BUILDING CAPACITY OF MOSQUES TO FUNCTION AS COMMUNITY HUBS. 2. ASSIST MOSQUES IN MATTERS OF GOVERNANCE. 3. ADVISE ON IMPROVED ACCESS AND INVOLVEMENT OF WOMEN AND YOUTH TO MOSQUES. 4. SPREAD BEST PRACTICE THROUGH THE DEVELOPMENT OF STANDARDS 5. ENCOURAGE MOSQUES TO BECOME CENTRES OF COMMUNITY COHESION, CITIZENSHIP AND DIALOGUE. 6. CO-OPERATE AND ENGAGE WITH OTHER REGULATORY AND NON-REGULATORY BODIES IN THE UK TO ENABLE MINAB TO ACHIEVE ITS AIMS AND OBJECTIVES.
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, NATIONAL
Contact information
- Address:
-
MINAB
Stone Hall
Chevening Road
London
NW6 6TN
- Phone:
- 02073724049
- Email:
- info@minab.org.uk
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window