THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF CHRIST CHURCH HEATON

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Parish church for Heaton, Bolton
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

15 Trustee(s)
42 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Other Charitable Activities
- Bolton
Governance
- 21 November 2009: Previously excepted registration
- CHRIST CHURCH HEATON PCC (Working name)
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
15 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Andrew William Holmes | Trustee | 05 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Dr Shyamala Ariyaratnam | Trustee | 05 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Dr Richard Ward Newton | Trustee | 05 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Patricia Bowie | Trustee | 05 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Andrew Graham Minors | Trustee | 05 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Stanley Gordon Wilson | Trustee | 05 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Joan Schofield | Trustee | 05 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Pamela Ann Knight | Trustee | 05 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Irene Morris | Trustee | 15 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Marie Christrine Syddall | Trustee | 16 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
PETER BROCKLEHURST SYDDALL | Trustee | 16 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Rajkumar Ariyaratnam | Trustee | 16 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Holly Bonfield | Trustee | 23 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
GEOFFREY FRANK TATTERSALL MA QC | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
HAZEL TATTERSALL | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £129.22k | £90.85k | £106.47k | £105.83k | £115.40k | |
|
Total expenditure | £100.82k | £86.27k | £116.19k | £110.56k | £129.76k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 10 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 10 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 17 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 17 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 09 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 09 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 06 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 06 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 31 January 2021 | 92 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 31 January 2021 | 92 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL POWERS MEASURE (1956) AS AMENDED AND CHURCH REPRESENTATION RULES
Charitable objects
Promoting in the ecclesiastical parish the whole mission of the Church.
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, LOCAL.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Christ Church Centre
Markland Hill
BOLTON
BL1 5AF
- Phone:
- 01204492169
- Email:
- cch.office@yahoo.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window