THE FENS CIRCUIT

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Fen's Circuit provides oversite, ecouragement and support to the churches within The Fens Circuit.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2024
People

29 Trustee(s)
1 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Cambridgeshire
- Norfolk
Governance
- 26 January 2010: Previously excepted registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
29 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev ADAM JAMES STEVENSON | Chair | 01 September 2019 |
|
|
||||
Mary Jane Hurst | Trustee | 25 September 2019 |
|
|
||||
Linda Vincent | Trustee | 25 September 2019 |
|
|||||
Rosemary Kay Marchant | Trustee | 25 September 2019 |
|
|
||||
Nicola Warden | Trustee | 25 September 2019 |
|
|
||||
Elaine Thornton | Trustee | 01 September 2019 |
|
|
||||
Rev Deborah Lee Caulk | Trustee | 01 September 2019 |
|
|
||||
Gwendoline Elsie Dewdney | Trustee | 01 September 2017 |
|
|
||||
ELIZABETH MARY GIBBS | Trustee | 01 September 2017 |
|
|
||||
Timothy David Dewdney | Trustee | 01 September 2017 |
|
|
||||
Roger Edward Dack | Trustee | 01 December 2016 |
|
|
||||
Sylvia Ringham | Trustee | 01 June 2015 |
|
|
||||
Mavis Ashcroft | Trustee | 14 February 2014 |
|
|
||||
JANICE POWERS | Trustee | 26 June 2012 |
|
|
||||
JOYCE DOBSON | Trustee | 26 June 2012 |
|
|
||||
Robin William Vincent | Trustee | 01 September 2006 |
|
|
||||
JOSEPHINE WENDY CHANDLER | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
DIANA BURLING | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
EVELYN HAMPS | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
JOAN THOMPSON | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
DAVID ADRIAN THOMPSON | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
SUSAN MARGARET DACK | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
VERONICA NELSON | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
JOY RUBY SMALLEY | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
ANNE ROSILAND EMMERSON | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
SUSAN ASKEW | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
TREVOR VINCENT | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
EILEEN SATTIN | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
ERIC CROSS | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | 31/08/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £327.35k | £503.74k | £189.91k | £203.63k | £251.16k | |
|
Total expenditure | £350.16k | £459.75k | £282.18k | £345.24k | £256.08k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Endowments | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Investment | N/A | £1.38k | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Other | N/A | £502.36k | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Legacies | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Other | N/A | £459.75k | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2024 | 06 March 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2024 | Accounts not yet received | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 15 February 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | 14 March 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 19 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | 01 June 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 31 March 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | 31 March 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 29 June 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | 29 June 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DEED OF UNION (1932) AND METHODIST CHURCH ACT (1976)
Charitable objects
The purposes of the Methodist Church are and shall be deemed to have been since the date of union the advancement of - (a) the Christian faith in accordance with the doctrinal standards and the discipline of the Methodist Church; (b) any charitable purpose for the time being of any Connexional, district, circuit, local or other organisation of the Methodist Church; (c) any charitable purpose for the time being of any society or institution subsiduary or ancillary to the Methodist Church; (d) any purpose for the time being of any charity being a charity subsidiary or ancillary to the Methodist Church.
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, LOCAL.
Contact information
- Address:
-
THE FENS CIRCUIT OFFICE
Trinity Methodist Church
17 Church Terrace
WISBECH
PE13 1BL
- Phone:
- 01945773567
- Email:
- fenscircuit@outlook.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window