THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST LUKE, THURNBY, LEICESTER

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We're a friendly, vibrant church in the heart of Thurnby, with a welcome for everyone. Central to all we try to do is our commitment to Jesus the Bible, worship and prayer.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

16 Trustee(s)
125 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Other Charitable Activities
- Leicestershire
Governance
- 30 November 2009: Previously excepted registration
- ST. LUKE'S PCC, THURNBY, LEICESTER (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
16 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Ann Carolyn Hollingworth | Trustee | 20 May 2024 |
|
|||||
Timothy John Heatley | Trustee | 20 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Melissa Amy Woodhead | Trustee | 20 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Elizabeth Anne Sawford | Trustee | 20 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Brian Green | Trustee | 26 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Robert Heatley | Trustee | 26 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Andrew Turnbull | Trustee | 26 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Robert Bevins | Trustee | 26 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Freya Bevins | Trustee | 26 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Kathrine Lount | Trustee | 26 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Russell Bentley | Trustee | 26 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
Julie Tregoning | Trustee | 26 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
Rev Thomas Devas | Trustee | 04 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
Richard Koelling | Trustee | 26 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
ELIZABETH JANE SMITH | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MR CHRIS GOODMAN | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £619.89k | £265.13k | £238.43k | £258.62k | £190.00k | |
|
Total expenditure | £264.69k | £194.32k | £230.48k | £338.56k | £236.00k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £18.68k | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £585.16k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £10.42k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £13.36k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Investment | £10.95k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Other | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Legacies | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £256.43k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £2.84k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £5.42k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 31 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 31 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 27 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 27 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 31 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 31 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 28 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 29 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 17 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 17 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL POWERS MEASURE (1956) AS AMENDED AND CHURCH REPRESENTATION RULES 02 JAN 1957
Charitable objects
Promoting in the ecclesiastical parish the whole mission of the Church.
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, LOCAL.
Contact information
- Address:
-
St. Lukes Church
Main Street
Thurnby
LEICESTER
LE7 9PN
- Phone:
- 07910843931
- Email:
- operations@thurnbychurch.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window