THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF CHRIST CHURCH BRIXTON ROAD

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Christ Church Brixton Road, is a Church of England Parish Church
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

10 Trustee(s)
10 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Lambeth
Governance
- 21 November 2009: Previously excepted registration
- CHRIST CHURCH BRIXTON ROAD PCC (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev Hugo Adan Fernandez | Chair | 30 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Alba Lopez Osorio | Trustee | 15 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Rev Stephen Robert Alexander Jullien | Trustee | 15 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Caiwen Yong | Trustee | 15 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
David Yepes | Trustee | 15 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Diana Posada Solano | Trustee | 15 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Simon Grantham | Trustee | 28 May 2023 |
|
|||||
Yvonne Burton | Trustee | 28 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
ROTIMI MEGHOMA | Trustee | 15 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Mrs C Brooks-Johnson | Trustee | 06 April 2014 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £93.65k | £122.44k | £72.87k | £51.57k | £92.08k | |
|
Total expenditure | £99.79k | £121.66k | £90.54k | £87.32k | £97.69k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 26 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 26 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 25 June 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 09 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 13 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 13 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 14 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 14 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 15 July 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 15 July 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL POWERS MEASURE (1956) AS AMENDED AND CHURCH REPRESENTATION RULES
Charitable objects
Promoting in the ecclesiastical parish the whole mission of the Church.
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, LOCAL.
Contact information
- Address:
-
PRIEST IN CHARGE CHRIST CHURCH
CHRIST CHURCH PARISH OFFICE
90 BRIXTON ROAD
LONDON
SW9 6BJ
- Phone:
- 02075871076
- Email:
- admin@christchurchbr.org.uk
- Website:
-
christchurchbr.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window