THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST. GILES BALDERTON, SOUTHWELL AND NOTTINGHAM

Charity Number: 1135321
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

PROMOTING IN THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH THE WHOLE MISSION OF THE CHURCH

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2024

Total income: £152,443
Total expenditure: £172,462

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Religious Activities
Who the charity helps:
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
  • Provides Services
Where the charity operates:
  • Nottinghamshire

Governance

Registration history:
  • 30 March 2010: Previously excepted registration
Organisation type:
Previously excepted
Other names:
  • ST. GILES PCC BALDERTON (Working name)
Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
  • Complaints handling
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Investing charity funds policy and procedures
  • Investment
  • Paying staff
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Social media policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

16 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Rev Elizabeth Louise Holliday Chair 07 April 2019
None on record
Rosie Jones Trustee 05 May 2024
None on record
Richard Jones Trustee 05 May 2024
None on record
Steve Caddy Trustee 05 May 2024
None on record
Ann Roberts Trustee 05 May 2024
None on record
Wilson Alison Trustee 15 May 2019
None on record
Ian Lawrence Trustee 07 April 2019
None on record
Kath Hirst Trustee 10 May 2017
None on record
Louise Holliday Trustee 09 May 2017
None on record
Madeline Gibson Trustee 09 May 2017
None on record
Lynn Green Trustee 09 May 2017
None on record
Mike Wilson Trustee 09 May 2017
None on record
DILYS HAYES CARBY Trustee
None on record
JOHN MICHAEL DODD B.ED Trustee
None on record
LINDA JOY LAWRENCE BSC PGCE Trustee
None on record
JEAN ANNE NEWSON Trustee
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023 31/12/2024
Total gross income £79.86k £112.00k £125.58k £120.29k £152.44k
Total expenditure £76.21k £94.57k £105.14k £136.83k £172.46k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £7.05k N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2024 04 March 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2024 04 March 2025 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2023 22 May 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 22 May 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2022 12 April 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 12 April 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2021 17 March 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 17 March 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2020 15 March 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 15 March 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
107 MAIN STREET
BALDERTON
NEWARK
NG24 3NN
Phone:
01636704811