THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST. LAWRENCE WITH ST. PAUL, LONGRIDGE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Church of England organisation providing religious services, pastoral care and chrisitian activities to the local area
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

21 Trustee(s)
60 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Other Charitable Activities
- Lancashire
Governance
- 11 March 2010: Standard registration
- THE PARISH OF ST. LAWRENCE WITH ST. PAUL LONGRIDGE PCC (Working name)
- Financial Conduct Authority
- Paying staff
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
21 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Amii Jayne Bateson | Trustee | 22 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Mary Heys | Trustee | 22 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Andrew Filder | Trustee | 23 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Philip Jones | Trustee | 09 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Rev Simon King | Trustee | 09 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Robert Stephen Bretherton | Trustee | 09 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Stephanie Willan | Trustee | 09 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Helen Clements | Trustee | 09 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
BARBARA BURTON | Trustee | 12 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Michael Frederick Dawson | Trustee | 12 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Karen Louise Ellen Boardman | Trustee | 29 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
Barbara McCormick | Trustee | 27 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
Rosemary Lyons | Trustee | 20 March 2019 |
|
|
||||
Dorothy Laver | Trustee | 22 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
Rev Michael James Barton | Trustee | 02 May 2017 |
|
|
||||
Annamarie Rogers-Waterman | Trustee | 27 April 2017 |
|
|
||||
Graham Kelsall | Trustee | 21 April 2015 |
|
|||||
VALERIE WARDLEY | Trustee | 26 November 2012 |
|
|
||||
DAVID HARTLEY | Trustee | 06 April 2011 |
|
|
||||
DOROTHY ANN LITTLE | Trustee |
|
||||||
VERNON CHARLES KINRADE | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £193.22k | £216.63k | £184.53k | £177.49k | £194.20k | |
|
Total expenditure | £247.66k | £217.00k | £199.63k | £264.12k | £189.27k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 02 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 02 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 02 May 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 02 May 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 16 August 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 17 August 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 29 March 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 29 March 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 26 August 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 26 August 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL POWERS MEASURE (1956) AS AMENDED AND CHURCH REPRESENTATION RULES 02 JAN 1957
Charitable objects
Promoting in the ecclesiastical parish the whole mission of the Church.
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, LOCAL.
Contact information
- Address:
-
7 CHAIGLEY ROAD
LONGRIDGE
PRESTON
PR3 3TQ
- Phone:
- 07545696915
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window