Financial history THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF EAST FARNWORTH AND KEARSLEY

Charity number: 1132008
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023 31/12/2024
Total gross income £51.93k £69.92k £50.68k £57.89k £70.45k
Total expenditure £47.43k £60.34k £51.79k £46.43k £70.77k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A