THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF EAST FARNWORTH AND KEARSLEY

Charity number: 1132008
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Parish Church

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2024

Total income: £70,454
Total expenditure: £70,767

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • General Charitable Purposes
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • Elderly/old People
  • People With Disabilities
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
  • Provides Services
Where the charity operates:
  • Bolton

Governance

Registration history:
  • 06 October 2009: Previously excepted registration
Organisation type:
Previously excepted
Other names:
  • PARISH OF FARNWORTH AND KEARSLEY (Working name)
Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Complaints handling
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

14 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Stephanie Buckley Trustee 23 April 2017
None on record
Nigel Ainsworth McFarlane Trustee 23 April 2017
None on record
Carole Edna Morgan Trustee 01 April 2016
None on record
Judith Patricia Birchill Trustee 01 April 2016
None on record
Sharon Goodwin Trustee 26 April 2015
None on record
Robert Albert McInyre Trustee 26 April 2015
None on record
Dr Steven Mann Trustee 26 April 2015
THE APSLEY PAPER TRAIL
Received: On time
Kim McIntyre Trustee 13 October 2013
None on record
ALISON ANNETTE MOLE Trustee 15 May 2011
None on record
DOROTHY MCGLYNN Trustee
None on record
MISS JACKIE POWEL Trustee
None on record
DOROTHY MARY NEEDHAM Trustee
None on record
Rev PHILIP STANLEY CASTLE Trustee
None on record
GRAHAM DOUGLAS MARTIN Trustee
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023 31/12/2024
Total gross income £51.93k £69.92k £50.68k £57.89k £70.45k
Total expenditure £47.43k £60.34k £51.79k £46.43k £70.77k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2024 29 April 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2024 29 April 2025 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2023 22 October 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 22 October 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2022 26 October 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022

(These accounts
have been qualified)

26 October 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2021 23 February 2023 115 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021

(These accounts
have been qualified)

23 February 2023 115 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2020 23 February 2023 480 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020

(These accounts
have been qualified)

23 February 2023 480 days late Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
55 Church Street
Farnworth
BOLTON
BL4 8AQ
Phone:
01204701934