CORNWALL ASSOCIATION FOR DEVELOPMENT EDUCATION (CADE)

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To promote education and active participation of young people and the public in sustainable development and global citizenship, by engaging in training and outreach work, making relevant resources available and supporting partnerships. Our beneficiaries include schools and educational establishments, youth and adult groups, private and public organisations and other educational practitioners.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

1 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Children/young People
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Cornwall
Governance
- 25 October 2010: Standard registration
- CADE (Working name)
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
1 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Chris Jones | Chair | 26 March 2014 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £614 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total expenditure | £775 | £0 | £0 | £1.51k | £0 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 19 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 14 May 2024 | 104 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 12 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 22 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 07 October 2021 | 249 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 13 MAY 2009
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF CHILDREN, YOUNG PEOPLE AND ADULTS IN CORNWALL BY PROVIDING AND ASSISTING IN THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES TO RAISE AWARENESS IN SUSTAINABLE DEVELOPMENT AND GLOBAL CITIZENSHIP AND OTHER SUBJECTS THE TRUSTEES SEE FIT.
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, LOCAL.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Flat 20
Heligan House
Pentewan
ST AUSTELL
Cornwall
PL32 9AD
- Phone:
- 07811125097
- Email:
- info@cade.org.uk
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window