THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST MICHAEL THE ARCHANGEL, ALCOMBE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We provide regular religious services, including services for young people. Support for families with children. Activities during the year for young people. Lunch club for elderly and those living alone in the community. Facilitate Alcombe Food Cupboard which supports families and individuals in need. Regular fund raising events for local, national and global mission.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

13 Trustee(s)
20 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Other Charitable Activities
- Somerset
Governance
- 04 November 2009: Previously excepted registration
- ST MICHAEL THE ARCHANGEL PCC, ALCOMBE (Working name)
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
13 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev KENNETH CROSS | Chair | 04 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
JONATHAN FRANCIS MILLS | Trustee | 23 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
SHEELAGH MARGARET SPINK | Trustee | 01 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Mike Lee | Trustee | 16 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
LESLEY ANN EDWARDS | Trustee | 18 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
JULIA HARPER | Trustee | 04 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
PAT WATKINS | Trustee | 16 May 2016 |
|
|
||||
Lyn Gower Edwards | Trustee | 06 April 2014 |
|
|
||||
AUDREY ELIZABETH FRIDESWIDE BATEMAN | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
RUTH ELIZABETH GASPERINI | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MRS SUE SMITH | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
PAULINE WARD BENNETT | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
JANE ELIZABETH JONES | Trustee |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £61.29k | £60.97k | £102.44k | £54.34k | £66.88k | |
|
Total expenditure | £76.13k | £56.74k | £60.96k | £66.43k | £76.09k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 19 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 19 September 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 17 September 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 17 September 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 18 May 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 18 May 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 19 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 19 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 08 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 08 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL POWERS MEASURE (1956) AS AMENDED AND CHURCH REPRESENTATION RULES
Charitable objects
Promoting in the ecclesiastical parish the whole mission of the Church.
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, LOCAL.
Contact information
- Address:
-
St Michael the Archangel
Church Street
Alcombe
MINEHEAD
TA24 6BL
- Phone:
- 01643709491
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window