THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST MATTHEW AND ST NATHANAEL, BRISTOL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
St Matthew's benefits the local and wider community by providing Christian religious worship services, providing resources for moral and intellectual development, enabling Christians to give support to their local community, allowing third party organisations to use church buildings & facilities, by providing weddings, funerals & baptisms, and by providing a place for prayer and support.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
Total income includes £81,738 from 1 government contract(s)
People

16 Trustee(s)
70 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Other Charitable Activities
- Bristol City
Governance
- 08 March 2010: Previously excepted registration
- ST MATTHEWS PCC, BRISTOL (Working name)
- Ofsted (Office For Standards In Education)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
16 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev Ian James Tomkins | Chair | 20 September 2018 |
|
|
||||
Rev Juliet Dellow | Trustee | 30 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
Gael Browne | Trustee | 12 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Timothy Mizen | Trustee | 12 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Kit Ling Siu | Trustee | 12 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Philip Nigel Scott May | Trustee | 12 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
David Fraser | Trustee | 14 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Melanie Bunce | Trustee | 14 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Professor Andrew James Hogg | Trustee | 14 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Alison Mary Parsons | Trustee | 22 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Laura Protheroe | Trustee | 07 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
Councillor Fabian Breckels | Trustee | 07 April 2019 |
|
|||||
Kevin Froud | Trustee | 15 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
Dr Alison Edmonds | Trustee | 15 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
Rev Richard Norman Pendlebury | Trustee | 29 November 2016 |
|
|||||
Canon Simon Pugh-Jones | Trustee | 18 April 2016 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £239.14k | £242.66k | £335.66k | £262.84k | £289.19k | |
|
Total expenditure | £248.36k | £248.19k | £251.73k | £338.60k | £263.29k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | £79.62k | £79.21k | £81.74k | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 22 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 22 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 02 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 02 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 31 May 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 31 May 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 09 November 2021 | 9 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 09 November 2021 | 9 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 18 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 18 September 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL POWERS MEASURE (1956) AS AMENDED AND CHURCH REPRESENTATION RULES
Charitable objects
Promoting in the ecclesiastical parish the whole mission of the Church.
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, LOCAL.
Contact information
- Address:
-
St. Matthews Church
Clare Road
Cotham
BRISTOL
BS6 5TB
- Phone:
- 01179441598
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window