THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF HEIGHAM, NORWICH

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Regular public worship Provision of prayer ministry/meditation/quiet prayer Pastoral work eg visiting sick/bereaved/elderly Teaching Christianity thro' sermons/courses/groups Promoting Christianity & Church mission thro events/meetings & activities for elderly/parents/young people/other groups Church services in care homes Supporting world mission/other charities Community meal
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

15 Trustee(s)
100 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Norfolk
Governance
- 05 November 2009: Previously excepted registration
- HOLY TRINITY PCC, HEIGHAM, NORWICH (Working name)
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
15 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev Alastair Gledhill | Trustee | 02 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Matthew Stevenson | Trustee | 22 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Noah James Marsh | Trustee | 22 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Dwayne Travis Royall | Trustee | 22 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Alexandra Hillman | Trustee | 22 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Nicola Mary Russell | Trustee | 22 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Caroline Frances Verdon-Smith | Trustee | 22 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Margaret Jowitt | Trustee | 22 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
PAUL HENERY | Trustee | 01 January 2022 |
|
|
||||
Jonathan Mason | Trustee | 27 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Dr Antony Christopher Gemmell Smith | Trustee | 05 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Dr Thomas Giles Gray | Trustee | 05 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Philip John Courtier | Trustee | 21 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Rev Richard David James | Trustee | 03 September 2017 |
|
|
||||
Jason Alexander Wilson | Trustee | 30 April 2016 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £334.05k | £344.58k | £368.56k | £324.00k | £387.44k | |
|
Total expenditure | £312.43k | £361.70k | £377.92k | £402.26k | £426.77k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £1.12k | £225 | £5.56k | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 29 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 29 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 26 May 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 26 May 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 09 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 09 September 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 29 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 29 September 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 13 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 13 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL POWERS MEASURE (1956) AS AMENDED AND CHURCH REPRESENTATION RULES
Charitable objects
Promoting in the ecclesiastical parish the whole mission of the Church.
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, LOCAL.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Holy Trinity Church
110A Trinity Street
NORWICH
NR2 2BJ
- Phone:
- 01603615533
- Email:
- info@trinitynorwich.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window