Trustees THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL FOR THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF BEWDLEY WITH RIBBESFORD & DOWLES
Charity number: 1132968

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
16 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Heather Fairs | Trustee | 24 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Susan Price | Trustee | 24 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Trevor John Hockin | Trustee | 16 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Kenneth John Hadley | Trustee | 16 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Alan Fairs | Trustee | 25 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
James Richard Perrin | Trustee | 25 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Yvonne Rundell | Trustee | 15 November 2020 |
|
|||||
John Graham Iles | Trustee | 15 November 2020 |
|
|
||||
John Adey | Trustee | 15 November 2020 |
|
|
||||
Diane Taylor | Trustee | 01 February 2018 |
|
|||||
Ann Capell | Trustee | 01 February 2018 |
|
|||||
PAUL WARNETT | Trustee | 17 January 2018 |
|
|
||||
Robert Barbour | Trustee | 01 January 2018 |
|
|
||||
RICHARD RUNDELL | Trustee | 01 January 2018 |
|
|||||
Barbara Fauset | Trustee | 01 January 2018 |
|
|
||||
MRS GILL WARNETT | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.