RAF BRIZE NORTON OFFICERS MESS

Charity number: 1132395
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

The object of the Officers' Mess is the promotion of military efficiency by the provision and support of mess, social, sporting and other facilities for the efficiency and well-being of Servicemen and Servicewomen. The objects also extend to making grants to any activity which in the opinion of the trustee is in furtherance of the objectives of the charity.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 29 February 2024

Total income: £368,631
Total expenditure: £371,940

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

Main way of carrying out purposes is grant making
What the charity does:
  • Armed Forces/emergency Service Efficiency
  • Other Charitable Purposes
Who the charity helps:
  • Other Defined Groups
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
  • Provides Services
Where the charity operates:
  • Oxfordshire

Governance

Registration history:
  • 29 October 2009: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
  • Complaints handling
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Conflicting interests
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Investing charity funds policy and procedures
  • Investment
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Social media policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

1 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Group Captain Louise Ann Henton Trustee 24 July 2024
THE ROYAL AIR FORCE WINTER SPORTS ALPINE ASSOCIATION
Received: 15 days late
RAF BRIZE NORTON SERGEANTS MESS
Received: On time
RAF BRIZE NORTON JRWF
Received: On time

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/05/2020 28/02/2021 28/02/2022 28/02/2023 29/02/2024
Total gross income £295.17k £147.02k £239.80k £391.87k £368.63k
Total expenditure £241.28k £84.67k £238.28k £387.03k £371.94k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 29 February 2024 21 December 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 29 February 2024 21 December 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 28 February 2023 23 October 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 28 February 2023 23 October 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 28 February 2022 27 September 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 28 February 2022 27 September 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 28 February 2021 24 September 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 28 February 2021 24 September 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 May 2020 25 March 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2020 25 March 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
OC Service Funds
RAF Brize Norton
Carterton
Oxfordshire
OX18 3LX
Phone:
01993896266
Website:

No information available