THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF CHRIST CHURCH HAMPSTEAD SQUARE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Worship has the greatest priority in the life of Christ Church. The closest of links are fostered with the church school. Considerable resources are put aside for a professional choir. Substantial repairs take place to conserve the fabric of the church and the PCC has designated as its main charity, the Diocese of Wiawso, a province of the Church of England in Ghana.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
Total income includes £12,016 from 1 government grant(s)
People

12 Trustee(s)
50 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Other Charitable Activities
- Camden
Governance
- 26 January 2010: Previously excepted registration
- CHRIST CHURCH, HAMPSTEAD (Working name)
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
12 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Harmen Van Den Hondel | Chair | 10 April 2017 |
|
|
||||
Robert Andrew Simkin | Trustee | 21 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Anthony Ronald | Trustee | 16 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Jessie Olumayowa Oyinlola | Trustee | 18 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Yiwei Li | Trustee | 18 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Karen Maree Harries | Trustee | 18 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Nicole Emma Lewis | Trustee | 28 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
Rodger Heeley | Trustee | 06 March 2019 |
|
|
||||
Joshua Oyinlola | Trustee | 09 April 2017 |
|
|
||||
JOHN GOLDSMITH | Trustee |
|
||||||
MICHAEL ROYALTON-KISCH | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MARTHA COLLINS ROLLE | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £164.18k | £139.20k | £201.32k | £270.62k | £181.17k | |
|
Total expenditure | £166.55k | £136.36k | £174.82k | £270.12k | £200.11k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £12.02k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 28 June 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 28 June 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 10 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 10 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 15 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 15 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 25 May 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 25 May 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 30 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 30 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL POWERS MEASURE (1956) AS AMENDED AND CHURCH REPRESENTATION RULES
Charitable objects
PROMOTING IN THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH THE WHOLE MISSION OF THE CHURCH.
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, LOCAL.
Contact information
- Address:
-
10 Cannon Place
London
NW3 1EJ
- Phone:
- 02074356784
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window