THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF THE CHURCH OF THE GOOD SHEPHERD, CARSHALTON BEECHES

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We carry out the expected activities of a parish church under the umbrella of the Church of England.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2024
People

16 Trustee(s)
50 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Sutton
Governance
- 23 October 2009: Previously excepted registration
- GOOD SHEPHERD, CARSHALTON BEECHES (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
16 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Anna-Marie Garratt | Trustee | 11 May 2025 |
|
|
||||
Margaret Suzanne Stevens | Trustee | 11 May 2025 |
|
|
||||
Peter John Clynton Graystone | Trustee | 14 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Rev Ian Nott | Trustee | 24 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
JOHN LESLIE MUNT | Trustee | 23 April 2023 |
|
|||||
Cheryl Ann Hudson | Trustee | 23 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Ruth Jadwiga Rutt | Trustee | 20 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Dr Mark Roger Crompton | Trustee | 03 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Michaela Louise Strivens | Trustee | 03 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Anthony William Thompson | Trustee | 09 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Michael Andrew Potter | Trustee | 31 May 2020 |
|
|
||||
DILANI PRIYANTHI PARARAJASINGAM | Trustee | 18 March 2018 |
|
|
||||
Rev KEVIN JAMES LEWIS | Trustee | 29 June 2017 |
|
|
||||
JUDITH GERMAIN | Trustee | 02 April 2017 |
|
|
||||
HANNAH CHARLOTTE FLOWERS | Trustee | 02 April 2017 |
|
|
||||
CHRISTOPHER JOHN NUTTING | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | 31/12/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £227.68k | £268.12k | £347.60k | £297.77k | £285.10k | |
|
Total expenditure | £232.51k | £227.05k | £272.51k | £221.79k | £341.06k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2024 | 19 May 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2024 | 19 May 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 18 April 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 18 April 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 03 May 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 03 May 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 22 April 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 22 April 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 17 May 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 17 May 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL POWERS MEASURE (1956) AS AMENDED AND CHURCH REPRESENTATION RULES
Charitable objects
Promoting in the ecclesiastical parish the whole mission of the Church.
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, LOCAL.
Contact information
- Address:
-
1 THE CLOSE
CARSHALTON
SM5 4PE
- Phone:
- 02086431147
- Email:
- No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window