THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF HORNCHURCH ST.ANDREW

Charity number: 1134813
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Promotes the Gospel through church services, group activities and working with the local community.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023

Total income: £335,138
Total expenditure: £386,400

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Religious Activities
Who the charity helps:
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
  • Provides Services
Where the charity operates:
  • Havering

Governance

Registration history:
  • 11 March 2010: Previously excepted registration
Organisation type:
Previously excepted
Other names:
  • THE PCC OF HORNCHURCH ST.ANDREW (Working name)
Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Complaints handling
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Paying staff
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

23 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Kathleen Wenborn Trustee 23 May 2024
None on record
Suzanne Hill Trustee 30 May 2023
None on record
Rev Mark Nicholas Trever Smeed Trustee 17 November 2022
None on record
Kenneth Green Trustee 14 May 2022
None on record
Rev Sonia Groombridge Trustee 14 May 2022
None on record
Rev Lisa Marie Bewick Trustee 14 May 2022
HORNCHURCH PASSION PLAY
Received: On time
Deborah McCarren Trustee 12 May 2022
None on record
Dr Marianne Ruth Hayward Rev Trustee 13 June 2021
None on record
Marian Beatrice Powell Trustee 22 October 2020
None on record
John Stephen Speller Trustee 26 April 2018
None on record
ANNE JARRETT Trustee 26 April 2018
None on record
JUDITH MARY BROOKS Trustee 27 April 2017
None on record
ALISON TANSLEY Trustee 27 April 2017
None on record
JULIE MARY JOHN Trustee 27 April 2017
None on record
ROGER ALAN DINES Trustee 21 April 2016
HUGUENOT SOCIETY OF GREAT BRITAIN AND IRELAND
Received: On time
Rev KENNETH ANDREW WYLIE Trustee 01 July 2014
ST ANDREWS (HORNCHURCH) CHURCHYARD MAINTENANCE TRUST
Received: On time
HORNCHURCH HOUSING TRUST
Received: 46 days late
Sandra Carol Cox Trustee 08 April 2014
None on record
PATRICIA ANN TAYLOR CLARK Trustee 27 May 2012
HORNCHURCH PASSION PLAY
Received: On time
CAROLE ANNE SHERRATT Trustee
None on record
CHRISTINE MARGARET WITHERS Trustee
None on record
Rev BARBARA ANN BAKER Trustee
None on record
PATRICIA ANN BROMHALL ADPR Trustee
None on record
Jeremy Brian Shearmur Trustee
ST ANDREWS (HORNCHURCH) CHURCHYARD MAINTENANCE TRUST
Received: On time

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £483.83k £357.80k £293.66k £313.37k £335.14k
Total expenditure £375.32k £311.03k £306.66k £330.52k £386.40k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 23 September 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 23 September 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2022 27 September 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 27 September 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2021 13 October 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 13 October 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2020 13 October 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 13 October 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2019 28 October 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 28 October 2020 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
222 HIGH STREET
HORNCHURCH
RM12 6QP
Phone:
01708441571