THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST ALKMUND AND ST WERBURGH, DERBY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We have the responsibility of co-operating with the Priest in Charge (currently in vacancy), in promoting in the ecclesiastical parish the whole mission of the Church, pastoral, evangelistic, social and ecumenical. We have maintenance responsibilities for the main church buildings that form St Alkmund's, 40 Kedleston Road, Derby.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

15 Trustee(s)
45 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Derby City
Governance
- 21 November 2009: Previously excepted registration
- ST ALKMUND'S PCC, DERBY (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
15 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Anita Jones | Trustee | 27 April 2024 |
|
|
||||||
Dr Andrew Morley | Trustee | 17 April 2024 |
|
|
||||||
Christopher Kay | Trustee | 17 April 2024 |
|
|
||||||
William Deeley | Trustee | 17 April 2024 |
|
|
||||||
Fay Price | Trustee | 01 August 2022 |
|
|
||||||
Rev Alice Wiliemhina Munns | Trustee | 07 November 2021 |
|
|||||||
Rev James Durrant | Trustee | 29 January 2021 |
|
|
||||||
Jonathan Schmidt | Trustee | 22 October 2020 |
|
|||||||
Dr Richard Crowson | Trustee | 24 April 2018 |
|
|
||||||
Jonathan Anthony Middleton Seddon | Trustee | 23 April 2018 |
|
|||||||
Rosemary Archer | Trustee | 23 April 2017 |
|
|
||||||
James Meek | Trustee | 13 April 2016 |
|
|
||||||
Cathy Travis | Trustee | 24 March 2015 |
|
|
||||||
Jacqueline Haywood | Trustee | 23 March 2014 |
|
|||||||
Hugh Craig | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £341.87k | £265.12k | £206.72k | £256.00k | £250.35k | |
|
Total expenditure | £318.28k | £251.07k | £244.23k | £223.59k | £240.23k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | £1.16k | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 30 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 30 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 31 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 31 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 22 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 22 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 16 November 2021 | 16 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 16 November 2021 | 16 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 11 November 2020 | 11 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 11 November 2020 | 11 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL POWERS MEASURE (1956) AS AMENDED AND CHURCH REPRESENTATION RULES
Charitable objects
Promoting in the ecclesiastical parish the whole mission of the Church.
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, LOCAL.
Contact information
- Address:
-
ST. ALKMUNDS CHURCH
40 KEDLESTON ROAD
DERBY
DE22 1GU
- Phone:
- 01332737058
- Email:
- office@stalkmunds.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window