Trustees THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE PARISH OF ST THOMAS THE APOSTLE, TROWBRIDGE
Charity number: 1132916
Up to date
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
16 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
ALLAN COUTTS | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Pamela Jean Thomas | Trustee | 27 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
Natasha Bristow | Trustee | 27 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
Geoffrey Carter | Trustee | 27 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
ROBERT ANDREW JONES | Trustee | 26 April 2016 |
|
|
||||
Patricia Ann Kerbey | Trustee | 29 April 2015 |
|
|
||||
David Bowater | Trustee | 29 April 2015 |
|
|
||||
BARBARA HAKES | Trustee | 29 April 2014 |
|
|
||||
Christopher James Farnell | Trustee | 29 April 2014 |
|
|
||||
RICHARD BUTLER | Trustee | 26 April 2013 |
|
|
||||
GEOFFREY TATE | Trustee | 26 April 2013 |
|
|||||
ESTHER BROWN | Trustee | 09 May 2012 |
|
|
||||
MRS MANDI ARCHER | Trustee | 09 May 2011 |
|
|
||||
GRAHAM PHILIP LEEDER BSC | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MARTYN WHITTOCK | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
ANGELA YVONNE GRIST | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.