THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF WATERLOO

Charity number: 1132457
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Regular Public Worship open to all Teaching of christianity Services to the Community with a Christian ethos Supporting other charities in the UK and overseas Promoting the whole mission of the church through provision of activities for all members of the community including young people Pastoral work including visiting the sick and bereaved

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023

Charitable expenditure

Charitable expenditure

Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.

In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.

Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.

By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

One or more trustees receive payments or benefits from the charity for another benefit.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Religious Activities
Who the charity helps:
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
  • Provides Services
Where the charity operates:
  • Lambeth
  • Southwark

Governance

Registration history:
  • 04 November 2009: Previously excepted registration
  • 20 May 2013: Funds received from 1126219 CREATIVE ST JOHN'S, WATERLOO
  • 13 November 2024: Funds received from 251594 WATERLOO PARISH CHARITY
Organisation type:
Previously excepted
Other names:
  • WATERLOO PCC (Working name)
Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
  • Complaints handling
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Conflicting interests
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Investment
  • Paying staff
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

19 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Felicity Amberson-Jones Trustee 21 April 2024
None on record
Rev Grey Collier Trustee 23 June 2023
None on record
James Anthony Godpower Deeny Trustee 23 April 2023
None on record
Eileen Margaret Hamilton Trustee 23 April 2023
THE ZAMBIA SOCIETY TRUST
Received: On time
Lydian Bangi Trustee 23 April 2023
OKUSINZA MU LUGANDA
Received: On time
Rev Georgia Anne Ashwell Trustee 25 June 2022
WATCH (WOMEN AND THE CHURCH)
Received: On time
Andrew Michael Humphreys Trustee 15 May 2022
None on record
Alice Mwanje Trustee 15 May 2022
OKUSINZA MU LUGANDA
Received: On time
Maya Sarah Gibbs Conway Trustee 15 May 2022
None on record
Robert John Smeath Trustee 16 May 2021
INSPIRE WALWORTH
Received: On time
Conny Kaweesa Trustee 16 May 2021
None on record
Concelyn Faye Clinch Trustee 14 September 2020
None on record
Patricia Eileen Thomas OBE Trustee 26 July 2020
None on record
Elaine Thomas Trustee 26 July 2020
THE BRIDGE AT WATERLOO
Received: On time
AMICABLE SOCIETY'S SCHOOL
Received: On time
ELIZABETH CLARSON Trustee 15 April 2018
None on record
IDA SERUNJOGI Trustee
None on record
REV GODFREY SAM KAZIRO Trustee
None on record
ESTER KAWOYA Trustee
BEACON TRUST
Received: On time
Rev GILES WILLIAM GODDARD Trustee
THE BRIDGE AT WATERLOO
Received: On time
SOUTHBANK AND WATERLOO NEIGHBOURS
Received: On time

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £655.48k £790.24k £1.74m £2.31m £832.44k
Total expenditure £708.15k £570.27k £1.23m £4.61m £649.10k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A £11.79k £12.14k
Income from government grants £73.33k £63.13k £509.29k £1.36m £26.66k
Income - Donations and legacies £451.23k £664.89k £1.53m £2.16m £309.19k
Income - Other trading activities £124.05k £63.81k £126.47k £88.89k £462.72k
Income - Charitable activities £23.70k £8.32k £35.27k £1.22k £189
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £56.50k £53.22k £53.95k £60.00k £60.34k
Income - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Legacies £0 £165.86k £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £663.23k £557.75k £1.16m £4.60m £604.40k
Expenditure - Raising funds £44.92k £12.51k £72.09k £11.79k £44.69k
Expenditure - Governance £1.72k £1.92k £5.80k £7.50k £3.00k
Expenditure - Grants institution £21.30k £70.35k £11.35k £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £8.79k £2.39k
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0

Assets and liabilities

Definitions for assets and liabilities
Own use assets

These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.

Long term Investments

Investments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.

Other assets

These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.

Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability

This is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.

Total liabilities

These are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Asset / Liability 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Own use assets £2.40k £924 £0 £154.25k £138.40k
Long-term investments £1.18m £1.19m £1.10m £1.34m £1.34m
Other assets £365.09k £569.02k £1.31m £328.73k £263.09k
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Total liabilities £106.01k £90.91k £228.04k £1.65m £1.39m

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 17 October 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 17 October 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2022 17 October 2024 352 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 17 October 2024 352 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2021 22 February 2023 114 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 22 February 2023 114 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2020 20 October 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 20 October 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2019 28 October 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 28 October 2020 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
ST. JOHNS VICARAGE
SECKER STREET
LONDON
SE1 8UF
Phone:
07762373674