THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST MICHAEL AND ALL ANGELS LEDBURY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
St Michael and All Angels is the parish church of Ledbury. It provides the spiritual focus for the population of Ledbury through regular religious services, work with local schools, visiting local care homes and hospitals. We also work with other groups within Ledbury. As an asset to the town, the building hosts concerts and civic occasions and is a tourist attraction.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

14 Trustee(s)
80 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Other Charitable Activities
- Herefordshire
Governance
- 21 November 2009: Previously excepted registration
- 14 September 2019: Funds received from 328399 THE ARTHUR AND BIDDY HEATON CHARITABLE TRUST
- PCC of Ledbury (Working name)
- ST MICHAEL AND ALL ANGELS LEDBURY (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
14 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev Keith Geoffrey Michael Hilton-Turvey | Chair | 18 October 2015 |
|
|||||
George William Hopkinson | Trustee | 10 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Richard John Nightingale | Trustee | 10 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Susan Elizabeth Simpson | Trustee | 01 July 2023 |
|
|||||
Stephen Baron Cheetham | Trustee | 07 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
Anne Scull | Trustee | 06 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Maria Dineen | Trustee | 06 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Susan Mary Cooper | Trustee | 17 June 2021 |
|
|
||||
William Baden George Wake | Trustee | 17 June 2021 |
|
|
||||
Ian Edward James | Trustee | 15 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
David Houghton | Trustee | 03 April 2019 |
|
|||||
Catherine Louise Beech | Trustee | 15 March 2018 |
|
|
||||
ANDREW JONATHAN BEECH | Trustee | 15 March 2018 |
|
|
||||
REV TONY HODDER | Trustee | 11 March 2013 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £303.66k | £439.37k | £214.21k | £175.37k | £133.65k | |
|
Total expenditure | £179.89k | £555.34k | £232.56k | £205.88k | £123.82k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £5.00k | £19.67k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 27 April 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 27 April 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 14 April 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 14 April 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 18 May 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 18 May 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 10 July 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 10 July 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 17 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 17 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL POWERS MEASURE (1956) AS AMENDED AND CHURCH REPRESENTATION RULES
Charitable objects
Promoting in the ecclesiastical parish the whole mission of the Church.
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, LOCAL.
Contact information
- Address:
-
The Croft
Woodleigh Road
LEDBURY
HR8 2BG
- Phone:
- 01531 631531
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window