THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF STOKE SAINT MICHAEL, COVENTRY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Regular public worship for all. Space for prayer/contemplation. Pastoral work.Teaching Christianity.Taking of school assemblies.Provision of Christian youth club.Promotion of Christianity by staging events. Promoting the whole mission of the Church through provision of activities for senior citizens, parents and toddlers and other special needs groups. Supporting charities in the UK and overseas.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

13 Trustee(s)
25 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Coventry City
Governance
- 10 December 2009: Previously excepted registration
- CALUDON PCC (Working name)
- STOKE ST MICHAEL PCC (Working name)
- THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCESIASTICAL PARISH OF CALUDON, COVENTRY (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
13 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Susan Morris | Trustee | 11 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Audrey Alldrick | Trustee | 22 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Glynis Wood | Trustee | 15 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Alice Chapman | Trustee | 08 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Adrian Graham Williams | Trustee | 01 June 2021 |
|
|
||||
Suzanne Bridget Sapiano | Trustee | 01 June 2021 |
|
|
||||
James McKay | Trustee | 20 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Graham Robert Medd | Trustee | 05 August 2019 |
|
|
||||
Rev Claire-Louise McARTHUR | Trustee | 08 July 2019 |
|
|
||||
Claire May THOMPSON | Trustee | 11 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
Christopher DRONFIELD | Trustee | 26 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
Neal William McGRATTAN | Trustee | 26 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
Ann Lynn BROWN | Trustee | 26 April 2018 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £290.26k | £429.56k | £121.81k | £256.25k | £116.83k | |
|
Total expenditure | £201.04k | £109.21k | £125.11k | £133.77k | £150.66k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 30 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 30 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 17 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 17 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 30 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 30 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 02 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 02 September 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 04 November 2020 | 4 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 31 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL POWERS MEASURE (1956) AS AMENDED AND CHURCH REPRESENTATION RULES as amended on 01 Aug 2019
Charitable objects
Promoting in the ecclesiastical parish the whole mission of the Church.
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, LOCAL.
Contact information
- Address:
-
ST. MICHAELS PARISH OFFICE
365B WALSGRAVE ROAD
COVENTRY
CV2 4BG
- Phone:
- 07747018597
- Email:
- clairethompson43@gmail.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window