Trustees THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF CHRIST CHURCH SOUTH OSSETT
Charity Number: 1133733

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
12 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Christopher Cowlishaw | Trustee | 14 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
CHARLOTTE EMMA ROBERTS | Trustee | 28 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Graham Nutter | Trustee | 28 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Jeanette Lorraine Burkey | Trustee | 21 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
ANNA MCKANN | Trustee | 21 May 2023 |
|
|||||
Gareth Worgan Phillips | Trustee | 21 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Peter Moore | Trustee | 21 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Heather Margaret Drayton | Trustee | 21 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
THOMAS PETER SMITH | Trustee | 08 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
JENNIFER ANN PHELAN | Trustee | 08 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Janet Nash | Trustee | 20 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Beverley Ann Cadman | Trustee | 30 April 2019 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.