THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF PIMLICO ST PETER WITH WESTMINSTER CHRIST CHURCH

Charity number: 1133033
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

St Peter's PCC has the responsibility of co-operating with the incumbent, in promoting in the ecclesiastical parish the whole mission of the church; pastoral, evangelistic, social & ecumenical. It also has the maintenance responsibilites for the church complex of St Peter's.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023

Charitable expenditure

Charitable expenditure

Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.

In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.

Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.

By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

One or more trustees are also directors of the subsidiaries

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Religious Activities
Who the charity helps:
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
  • Provides Services
Where the charity operates:
  • City Of Westminster

Governance

Registration history:
  • 01 December 2009: Previously excepted registration
Organisation type:
Previously excepted
Other names:
  • ST PETER'S EATON SQUARE PCC (Working name)
Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
  • Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
  • Complaints handling
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Conflicting interests
  • Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Investing charity funds policy and procedures
  • Investment
  • Paying staff
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Social media policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

23 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Rev Jennifer Eileen Midgley-Adam Trustee 06 May 2025
None on record
JAMES MARK WATSON Trustee 23 May 2024
None on record
Stephen Couttie Trustee 23 May 2024
None on record
OLIVER STEPHEN GRANT Trustee 23 May 2024
None on record
RAANA KHATABAKHSH Trustee 23 May 2024
None on record
Dr NICHOLAS NIGEL MOORE Trustee 23 May 2024
None on record
CARLOS REMOTTI-BRETON Trustee 24 April 2024
None on record
MAITE BOUDY Trustee 18 May 2023
None on record
EVELYN OLUGBOJA Trustee 18 May 2023
None on record
ROBIN NEEL DUTTSON Trustee 18 May 2023
None on record
Rev Jonathan George Frederick Kester Trustee 17 July 2022
THE PIMLICO ST PETER TRUST
Received: On time
SION COLLEGE
Received: On time
ANGLICAN CATHOLIC FUTURE
Received: On time
Jane Franses Trustee 26 May 2022
NEVER SUCH INNOCENCE
Received: On time
Lee Marshall Trustee 26 May 2022
None on record
Professor Alexandra Tangney Trustee 26 May 2022
None on record
Dr Julia Jordan Trustee 26 May 2022
None on record
MARY DRUMMOND Trustee 26 May 2022
None on record
John Hilary Trustee 20 May 2021
None on record
Samantha Singlehurst Trustee 20 May 2021
None on record
Ekanem Peers Trustee 15 October 2020
None on record
RICHARD ANTHONY CARTER Trustee 25 March 2014
EL TELEFONO DE LA ESPERANZA
Received: On time
James Milne Wallington Glen Trustee 30 October 2013
WESTMINSTER TREE TRUST
Received: On time
ST. PETER'S EATON SQUARE PRIMARY SCHOOL TRUST
Received: On time
VALERIE ANNE SMITH Trustee 26 July 2011
THE TILLYER AND CHIDWICK TRUST
Received: On time
Dr JUDITH FRANCES RICHARDSON Trustee
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £516.17k £475.39k £502.32k £524.88k £550.00k
Total expenditure £482.74k £526.77k £457.93k £568.50k £527.51k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A £39.22k £24.81k N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £263.67k N/A £284.19k £296.15k £288.44k
Income - Other trading activities £244.52k N/A £211.07k £223.81k £238.53k
Income - Charitable activities £0 N/A £60 £0 £0
Income - Endowments £0 N/A £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £7.84k N/A £7.00k £4.85k £9.93k
Income - Other £142 N/A £0 £60 £0
Income - Legacies £0 N/A £0 £200 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £479.30k N/A £457.93k £568.50k £527.51k
Expenditure - Raising funds £3.44k N/A £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Governance £4.68k N/A £5.99k £1.94k £5.20k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 N/A £60 £7.63k £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 N/A £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 N/A £0 £0 £0

Assets and liabilities

Definitions for assets and liabilities
Own use assets

These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.

Long term Investments

Investments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.

Other assets

These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.

Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability

This is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.

Total liabilities

These are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Asset / Liability 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Own use assets £0 N/A £0 £0 £0
Long-term investments £209.22k N/A £220.65k £213.87k £219.46k
Other assets £270.36k N/A £276.11k £208.18k £224.98k
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability £0 N/A £0 £0 £0
Total liabilities £176.69k N/A £189.42k £163.08k £157.39k

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 07 August 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 07 August 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2022 20 July 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 20 July 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2021 15 August 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 15 August 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2020 26 October 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 26 October 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2019 31 October 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 31 October 2020 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
ST. PETERS C OF E CHURCH
119 EATON SQUARE
LONDON
SW1W 9AL
Phone:
020 7235 4482