THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST ALDHELM, EDMONTON

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Parish Church of Upper Edmonton, Church of England, providing church services and other related activities, plus community church hall
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
Total income includes £55,124 from 1 government grant(s)
People

18 Trustee(s)
30 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Enfield
Governance
- 16 October 2009: Previously excepted registration
- ST ALDHELM'S PCC, EDMONTON (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
18 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev Anna Stuttard | Chair | 08 March 2020 |
|
|
||||
Pamela Carson | Trustee | 26 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Ijeoma Ogbonna | Trustee | 14 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Melissa Quashie | Trustee | 29 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Rev Patricia Brown | Trustee | 29 May 2022 |
|
|||||
Joan Sandra McLeish | Trustee | 29 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Rebekah Grey-Bubu | Trustee | 29 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Desmond Williams | Trustee | 29 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
EDIE DUNCAN | Trustee | 29 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Mary Irish | Trustee | 29 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Ann Juneta Toussaint | Trustee | 23 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Peter Clark | Trustee | 23 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Gloria Marjorie Littler | Trustee | 23 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
MERLENE NURSE | Trustee | 27 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Zavia Parker | Trustee | 11 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Maureen Smith | Trustee | 11 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
LORRAINE PAMELA COPPIN | Trustee | 11 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
David John Reed | Trustee | 11 October 2020 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £110.87k | £124.56k | £129.04k | £142.82k | £204.03k | |
|
Total expenditure | £104.01k | £126.33k | £129.95k | £137.88k | £119.69k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | £26.10k | £1.78k | £55.12k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 12 August 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 12 August 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 19 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 19 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 17 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 17 September 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 14 June 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 14 June 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 27 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 27 September 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL POWERS MEASURE (1956) AS AMENDED AND CHURCH REPRESENTATION RULES
Charitable objects
Promoting in the ecclesiastical parish the whole mission of the Church.
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, LOCAL
Contact information
- Address:
-
2 WINDMILL ROAD
LONDON
N18 1PA
- Phone:
- 07599 960129
- Email:
- vicar@aldhelms.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window