CEMETERY ROAD BAPTIST CHURCH, SHEFFIELD

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Regular public worship, including prayer, Bible study, preaching, teaching and observance of the sacraments of Communion and Baptism. Evangelism, mission, and the nurture of Christian disciples, including education and training for Christian and community service. Giving and encouraging pastoral care and charitable social action. Encouraging and supporting Baptists and other Christians.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

11 Trustee(s)
35 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Sheffield City
Governance
- 25 November 2009: Previously excepted registration
- CRB CHURCH (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Hannah Gracelin John | Trustee | 01 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
Beverley Cassandra Caton | Trustee | 01 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
Jonathan Kenneth Eales | Trustee | 01 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
Isobel Ruth Dexter | Trustee | 01 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Rev Andrew Philip Ginn | Trustee | 01 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Paul Riley | Trustee | 08 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
David John Timms | Trustee | 08 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
Dr Anthony John Cowling | Trustee | 08 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
Lois Ruth McGrath | Trustee | 01 January 2022 |
|
|||||
Yvonne Timms | Trustee | 01 January 2019 |
|
|
||||
Andrew Atkin | Trustee | 01 January 2018 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £201.78k | £328.73k | £169.56k | £190.84k | £208.95k | |
|
Total expenditure | £279.29k | £314.82k | £149.00k | £99.95k | £292.36k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 23 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 23 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 31 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 31 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 09 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 09 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 31 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 31 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 30 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 30 September 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 08 SEPTEMBER 2009
Charitable objects
The principal purpose of the Church is the advancement of the Christian faith according to the principles of the Baptist denomination. The Church may also advance education and carry out other charitable purposes in the United Kingdom and/or other parts of the world.
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, LOCAL.
Contact information
- Address:
-
10 Springfield Glen
SHEFFIELD
S7 2HL
- Phone:
- 0751923086
- Email:
- admin@crbchurch.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window