Financial history THE HAMBLIN TRUST

Charity Number: 1133567
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/07/2020 31/07/2021 31/07/2022 31/07/2023 31/07/2024
Total gross income £94.47k £113.13k £95.72k £31.53k £17.81k
Total expenditure £94.06k £107.82k £153.12k £77.13k £62.16k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £10.00k £45.02k N/A N/A N/A