Financial history THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF CHRIST CHURCH HIGHER BEBINGTON

Charity number: 1132356
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £309.33k £239.40k £194.78k £274.78k £264.57k
Total expenditure £443.31k £221.72k £198.68k £246.51k £262.43k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £11.97k £13.41k £52.17k N/A