THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST JAMES' MALDEN

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Church of England religious activities and pastoral care.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

18 Trustee(s)
5 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Kingston Upon Thames
Governance
- 10 March 2010: Previously excepted registration
- PCC ST JAMES' MALDEN (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
18 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev Katie Thomas | Chair | 01 May 2018 |
|
|
||||
ChongHwa Yeam | Trustee | 19 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Tamsin Griffiths | Trustee | 19 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Alison Mary Brennan | Trustee | 19 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Geoff Butcher | Trustee | 28 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Patricia Benson | Trustee | 28 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Helena Joan Lawton | Trustee | 28 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Sophie Anderson | Trustee | 15 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Nigel Ransom | Trustee | 13 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
Emma Green | Trustee | 13 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
Michael Green | Trustee | 13 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
Christopher Feltham | Trustee | 13 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
Michelle Akintoye | Trustee | 25 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
Serena Joanna Harrington Josolyne | Trustee | 18 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
Diana Judith Schuldt | Trustee | 18 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
Trevor William Deadman | Trustee | 18 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
Valerie Ann Gibbens | Trustee | 18 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
JOHN TAYLOR | Trustee | 29 October 2011 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £141.48k | £123.55k | £122.94k | £303.35k | £249.96k | |
|
Total expenditure | £146.16k | £117.13k | £122.42k | £136.55k | £173.63k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 10 June 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 10 June 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 05 June 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 05 June 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 28 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 28 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 31 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 31 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 21 July 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 21 July 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL POWERS MEASURE (1956) AS AMENDED AND CHURCH REPRESENTATION RULES
Charitable objects
Promoting in the ecclesiastical parish the whole mission of the Church.
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, LOCAL
Contact information
- Address:
-
St. James Church
Bodley Road
NEW MALDEN
KT3 5QE
- Phone:
- 02089425070
- Email:
- office@stjamesmalden.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window