THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF SKEGBY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Mission and Ministry in the Ecclesiastical parish of Skegby, St Andrew
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

20 Trustee(s)
35 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Nottinghamshire
Governance
- 21 November 2009: Standard registration
- ST ANDREW'S PCC, SKEGBY (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
20 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev PETER CHANTRY | Chair | 24 March 2021 |
|
|||||
Karen Bradshaw | Trustee | 09 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Peter Smythe | Trustee | 09 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
Sharon Hallam | Trustee | 19 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Ian Hallam | Trustee | 19 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Pamela Mary Shaw | Trustee | 01 May 2018 |
|
|
||||
Lauren Dykes | Trustee | 01 May 2018 |
|
|
||||
MARTYN JOHN BOWLER | Trustee | 06 March 2016 |
|
|
||||
Anthony Cooke | Trustee | 06 March 2016 |
|
|
||||
Richard Patrick Mountain | Trustee | 06 March 2016 |
|
|
||||
SUSAN CAROL MOUNTAIN | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
JOHN MICHAEL CRAFTS | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
JOSEPHINE MARY WHITBREAD | Trustee |
|
||||||
GRAHAM CLARKE | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MARY LILY COLLINS | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
ROBERT ANTHONY HALLAM | Trustee |
|
||||||
PHILIP OSBORNE | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
ELEANOR ELIZABETH GREAVES CERT ED | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
JOHN WHITBREAD | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
PAMELA LESLEY CLARKE | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £91.10k | £84.02k | £175.25k | £105.89k | £144.42k | |
|
Total expenditure | £91.08k | £93.19k | £136.22k | £111.86k | £148.41k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | £6.87k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 27 June 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 27 June 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 30 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 30 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 31 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 31 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 08 December 2021 | 38 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 08 December 2021 | 38 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 27 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 27 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL POWERS MEASURE (1956) AS AMENDED AND CHURCH REPRESENTATION RULES
Charitable objects
Promoting in the ecclesiastical parish the whole mission of the Church.
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, LOCAL.
Contact information
- Address:
-
THE VICARAGE
MANSFIELD ROAD
SKEGBY
SUTTON-IN-ASHFIELD
NG17 3ED
- Phone:
- 01623558800
- Email:
- office@skegbyparish.org.uk
- Website:
-
skegbyparish.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window