ASD FAMILY HELP

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
ASD Family Help provides information, activities and support for autistic or neurodiverse individuals or those with learning difficulties (plus their parents, carers or professionals), within Wokingham, West Berkshire (England) & Pembrokeshire (Wales).
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
Total income includes £25,640 from 2 government contract(s) and £21,620 from 1 government grant(s)
People

5 Trustee(s)
15 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Disability
- Recreation
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Pembrokeshire
- West Berkshire
- Wokingham
Governance
- 28 April 2010: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
David Gander | Chair | 23 September 2018 |
|
|
||||
Emma Louise Evans | Trustee | 25 March 2025 |
|
|
||||
Sally Grayell | Trustee | 17 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
ANNETTE ROBERTS | Trustee | 08 March 2019 |
|
|
||||
Toni Lorraine Fraser | Trustee | 01 December 2014 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £126.84k | £167.14k | £137.44k | £131.55k | £254.26k | |
|
Total expenditure | £145.99k | £133.83k | £112.55k | £131.26k | £249.67k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £25.64k | |
|
Income from government grants | £12.83k | £10.74k | £13.61k | £36.50k | £21.62k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 02 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 02 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 28 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 28 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 02 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 02 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 29 July 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 29 July 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 28 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 28 September 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED MADE 21 SEPTEMBER 2009 AS AMENDED 30 MARCH 2010 as amended on 08 Mar 2019 as amended on 04 Oct 2023 as amended on 08 Feb 2024 as amended on 28 Mar 2024
Charitable objects
For the public benefit relieving the needs of children & adults with Autism (ASD/ASC, Asperger’s Syndrome, High Functioning Autism), &/or co-morbid associated Learning Difficulties or Learning Disabilities, their parents/families and carers in the Berkshire Boroughs of Wokingham & West Berkshire in England, and Pembrokeshire in Wales, by; 1. providing support services and activities 2. working across the community to develop services needed 3. by representing the views of those effected 4. advancing the education of the public in the subject of disability
Area of benefit
WOKINGHAM
Contact information
- Address:
-
CADOMIN
HURST
READING
RG10 0DS
- Phone:
- 07707660599
- Email:
- contact@asdfamilyhelp.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window