Financial history EMSWORTH BAPTIST CHURCH

Charity Number: 1134670
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £132.16k £128.58k £153.82k £177.60k £173.28k
Total expenditure £145.77k £126.05k £142.01k £166.82k £176.20k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A