EMSWORTH BAPTIST CHURCH

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Church provides Christian worship, prayer, pastoral care and a range of events for all ages in a newly-built (2015) modern facility. Weekly coffee, craft and art groups meet, which are attended by local people. Children's, families' and youth work is varied. Ministries are developing to meet the needs of the Emsworth community. We let our premises to outside groups and organisations.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

10 Trustee(s)
120 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Other Charitable Activities
- Hampshire
- West Sussex
Governance
- 05 March 2010: Previously excepted registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Social media policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev JOEL FERREIRA | Chair | 01 September 2014 |
|
|
||||
Man Kit Chau | Trustee | 21 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Glenn Gordon Holland | Trustee | 21 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Catherine Ruth March | Trustee | 21 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Dr Edmund Derbyshire | Trustee | 25 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Rev Matthew Ferreira | Trustee | 01 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Andrew Woodley | Trustee | 01 January 2022 |
|
|
||||
Anthony Paul Cluley | Trustee | 26 January 2020 |
|
|
||||
Simon Cargill | Trustee | 26 January 2020 |
|
|
||||
Rebecca Collison | Trustee | 26 January 2020 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £132.16k | £128.58k | £153.82k | £177.60k | £173.28k | |
|
Total expenditure | £145.77k | £126.05k | £142.01k | £166.82k | £176.20k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 23 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 23 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 16 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 16 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 14 July 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 14 July 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 25 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 25 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 27 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 27 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 24 SEPTEMBER 2009
Charitable objects
THE PRINCIPAL PURPOSE OF THE CHURCH IS THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE CHRISTIAN FAITH ACCORDING TO THE PRINCIPLES OF THE BAPTIST DENOMINATION. THE CHURCH MAY ALSO ADVANCE EDUCATION AND CARRY OUT OTHER CHARITABLE PURPOSES IN THE UNITED KINGDOM AND/OR OTHER PARTS OF THE WORLD.
Area of benefit
UNITED KINGDOM AND/OR OTHER PARTS OF THE WORLD.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Emsworth Baptist Church
North Street
EMSWORTH
PO10 7BY
- Phone:
- 01243375606
- Email:
- admin@emsbaptist.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window