Trustees EMSWORTH BAPTIST CHURCH
Charity Number: 1134670

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev JOEL FERREIRA | Chair | 01 September 2014 |
|
|
||||
Man Kit Chau | Trustee | 21 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Glenn Gordon Holland | Trustee | 21 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Catherine Ruth March | Trustee | 21 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Dr Edmund Derbyshire | Trustee | 25 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Rev Matthew Ferreira | Trustee | 01 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Andrew Woodley | Trustee | 01 January 2022 |
|
|
||||
Anthony Paul Cluley | Trustee | 26 January 2020 |
|
|
||||
Simon Cargill | Trustee | 26 January 2020 |
|
|
||||
Rebecca Collison | Trustee | 26 January 2020 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.