THIRSK AND NORTHALLERTON METHODIST CIRCUIT

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The purposes of the charity are the advancement of a.the Christian faith in accordance with the doctrinal standards and discipline of Methodist church b.any charitable purpose of thMethodist church and it's associated instuitions and subsiduarys.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2023
People

25 Trustee(s)
8 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Other Charitable Activities
- North Yorkshire
Governance
- 28 January 2010: Previously excepted registration
- THIRSK AND NOTHALLERTON METHODIST CIRCUIT (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
25 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Erik Matthews | Trustee | 15 November 2024 |
|
|||||
Naomi Alejandra Hogan | Trustee | 18 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Rev Kim Hurst | Trustee | 01 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
KEITH SMITH | Trustee | 14 May 2024 |
|
|||||
Megan Turner | Trustee | 01 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Lesley Hansen | Trustee | 01 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Rev Ian Johnson | Trustee | 01 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Lynne Sharp | Trustee | 26 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Robert Lynton Portsmouth | Trustee | 01 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
William George Harker | Trustee | 01 September 2022 |
|
|||||
Stephen Mark Reynolds | Trustee | 01 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Thelma Richardson | Trustee | 01 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Catherine Louise Woods | Trustee | 01 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Dorothy Margaret McCrea | Trustee | 01 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Andrew Simon Dalby | Trustee | 01 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
alana barney | Trustee | 01 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Kevin Richard Baker | Trustee | 17 October 2018 |
|
|
||||
Karen Portsmouth | Trustee | 31 March 2017 |
|
|
||||
Judith Walker | Trustee | 31 March 2017 |
|
|
||||
Kathryn Walker | Trustee | 31 March 2017 |
|
|
||||
Karen Yvonne Collin | Trustee | 31 March 2017 |
|
|
||||
AUDREY POWELL | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
Rev Michael Webster | Trustee |
|
||||||
BRENDA DENNISON | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
ANTHONY BROWN | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2019 | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £135.37k | £149.61k | £303.19k | £219.78k | £210.08k | |
|
Total expenditure | £228.61k | £219.43k | £230.86k | £295.68k | £194.34k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 05 June 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | 05 June 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 03 April 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | 03 April 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 25 March 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | 25 March 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 30 July 2021 | 30 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | 30 July 2021 | 30 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2019 | 28 May 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2019 | 28 May 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DEED OF UNION (1932) AND METHODIST CHURCH ACT (1976)
Charitable objects
The purposes of the Methodist Church are and shall be deemed to have been since the date of union the advancement of - (a) the Christian faith in accordance with the doctrinal standards and the discipline of the Methodist Church; (b) any charitable purpose for the time being of any Connexional, district, circuit, local or other organisation of the Methodist Church; (c) any charitable purpose for the time being of any society or institution subsiduary or ancillary to the Methodist Church; (d) any purpose for the time being of any charity being a charity subsidiary or ancillary to the Methodist Church.
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, LOCAL.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Northallerton Methodist Church
High Street
NORTHALLERTON
North Yorkshire
DL7 8EG
- Phone:
- 07808627964
- Email:
- tandnacircuit@gmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window