SOUTHDOWN METHODIST CHURCH
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The purpose of Southdown Methodist Church is the advancement of the Christian Faith in accordance with the doctrinal standards and the discipline of the Methodist Church. We do this by worshipping, learning and caring for those in our community, acts of service and making more disciples of Jesus Christ.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2024
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Religious Activities
- Recreation
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Other Charitable Activities
- Hertfordshire
Governance
- 28 January 2010: Previously excepted registration
- 24 January 2025: Removed (Does not operate)
No other names
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | 31/08/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £65.22k | £132.92k | £137.64k | £66.22k | £73.22k | |
|
Total expenditure | £74.35k | £156.76k | £140.90k | £68.31k | £110.59k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2024 | 22 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2024 | 22 October 2024 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 27 November 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | 27 November 2023 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 17 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | 17 January 2023 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 05 July 2022 | 5 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | 05 July 2022 | 5 days late | |
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 15 May 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | 15 May 2021 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
METHODIST CHURCH ACT (1939), METHODIST CHURCH FUNDS ACT (1960) AND DEED OF UNION (1932)
Charitable objects
The purposes of the Methodist Church are and shall be deemed to have been since the date of union the advancement of - (a) the Christian faith in accordance with the doctrinal standards and the discipline of the Methodist Church; (b) any charitable purpose for the time being of any Connexional, district, circuit, local or other organisation of the Methodist Church; (c) any charitable purpose for the time being of any society or institution subsiduary or ancillary to the Methodist Church; (d) any purpose for the time being of any charity being a charity subsidiary or ancillary to the Methodist Church.
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, LOCAL
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window