Accounts and annual returns MORLEY TECHNICAL INSTITUTE AMATEUR OPERATIC SOCIETY

Charity number: 500601
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 03 October 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 03 October 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2023 03 October 2024 246 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 03 October 2024 246 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2022 04 September 2023 216 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 04 September 2023 216 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2021 04 September 2023 581 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2020 04 September 2023 946 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 04 September 2023 946 days late Download Open in new window