HAMPDEN VIEW WESLEYAN REFORM CHURCH

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We run a Toddler Group, Girls Brigade, Kids Club every week and take school assemblies. For Adults we have a fellowship group/bible study every week. We hold two worship services on a Sunday.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
5 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Other Charitable Activities
- Sheffield City
Governance
- 30 March 2010: Standard registration
- HAMPDEN VIEW CHURCH (Working name)
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Alina Taylor | Trustee | 23 November 2015 |
|
|
||||
ELAINE TUCKETT | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
KATHLEEN JULIA HODSON | Trustee |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £14.74k | £14.29k | £11.38k | £13.71k | £18.97k | |
|
Total expenditure | £15.08k | £11.68k | £14.24k | £15.91k | £19.28k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 30 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 31 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 02 February 2023 | 2 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 04 February 2022 | 4 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 24 March 2021 | 52 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
WESLEYAN REFORM CHURCH REFERENCE DEED 25 SEPTEMBER 2009
Charitable objects
THE TRUSTEES FOR THE TIME BEING SHALL AT ALL TIMES PERMIT THE SAID PREMISES AND THE CHAPEL SCHOOL OR OTHER BUILDINGS FROM TIME TO TIME STANDING THEREON TO BE USED AND OCCUPIED AND ENJOYED AS A PLACE FOR THE PUBLIC WORSHIP OF GOD AND FOR THE INSTRUCTION OF CHILDREN AND ADULTS UNDER THE DIRECTION OF THE SOCIETY OR CHURCH ASSEMBLING FOR WORSHIP THEREON IN CONNECTION WITH THE SAID DENOMINATION OR CONNECTION ACCORDING TO THE PRINCIPLES CONSTITUTION USAGE'S POLITY AND RULES FROM TIME TO TIME OF THE SAID DENOMINATION AND ALSO FOR THE PROMOTION OF SUCH OTHER RELIGIOUS, EDUCATIONAL OR CHARITABLE PURPOSES AS THE SAID SOCIETY OR CHURCH SHALL FROM TIME TO TIME DIRECT. AND RECOGNITION OF SUCH NEEDS IN THE LOCAL AREAS; (C) INSTIGATING AND ADHERING TO AND FURTHERING THE AIMS AND OBJECTS OF THE PRE-SCHOOL LEARNING ALLIANCE.
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, LOCAL
Contact information
- Address:
-
2 Herringthorpe Avenue
ROTHERHAM
S65 3AA
- Phone:
- 01709361705
- Email:
- HAMPDEN@BLUEYONDER.CO.UK
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window