THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF CLUBMOOR

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
ÔÇóRegular public worship open to all ÔÇó provision of sacred space for prayer ÔÇóPastoral work ÔÇóTeaching of ChristianityÔÇóTaking of religious assemblies in schools ÔÇóprovision of childrens' and youth groups with a Christian ethos ÔÇóPromotion of Christianity through activities, events and distribution of literature ÔÇóSupporting other charities in the UK and overseas
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
Total income includes £2,500 from 2 government grant(s)
People

21 Trustee(s)
50 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Liverpool City
Governance
- 04 February 2010: Previously excepted registration
- ST ANDREW'S, CLUMOOR (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
21 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Hazel Simpson | Trustee | 15 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Gillian Beesley | Trustee | 15 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Helen McGuiness | Trustee | 15 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Maureen Jones | Trustee | 15 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Charmaine Reynolds | Trustee | 15 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
David Kirk | Trustee | 15 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Patricia Hughes | Trustee | 15 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Rev William Jacob Gibbons | Trustee | 19 February 2023 |
|
|
||||
Simon James Huthwaite | Trustee | 21 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
WENDY PEACOCK | Trustee | 21 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
Marie Jenkinson | Trustee | 21 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
Patricia Ann Bacon | Trustee | 21 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
Dr Claire Elizabeth Pollard | Trustee | 21 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
Beryl Bellew | Trustee | 21 June 2021 |
|
|
||||
Carol Wilson | Trustee | 07 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Karen Marjorie Speariett | Trustee | 20 January 2020 |
|
|
||||
Kerry Michelle Dodd | Trustee | 20 January 2020 |
|
|
||||
SUE JAMIESON | Trustee | 20 May 2019 |
|
|
||||
AMANDA JOY BUSHNELL | Trustee | 20 May 2019 |
|
|
||||
JULIA PATRICIA FORD | Trustee | 20 May 2019 |
|
|
||||
BLAIR DRYDEN BUSHNELL | Trustee | 20 May 2019 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £180.35k | £162.64k | £126.34k | £135.05k | £125.05k | |
|
Total expenditure | £168.61k | £157.84k | £117.14k | £116.21k | £154.07k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £280 | N/A | £5.20k | £2.50k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 24 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 24 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 26 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 26 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 26 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 26 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 15 November 2021 | 15 days late | |
Accounts and TAR |
31 December 2020
(These accounts |
15 November 2021 | 15 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 17 November 2020 | 17 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 17 November 2020 | 17 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL POWERS MEASURE (1956) AS AMENDED AND CHURCH REPRESENTATION RULES
Charitable objects
Promoting in the ecclesiastical parish the whole mission of the Church.
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, LOCAL.
Contact information
- Address:
-
176 Queens Drive
West Derby
Liverpool
L13 0AL
- Phone:
- 01512261977
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window