THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST NICOLAS GUILDFORD

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Promoting in the ecclesiastical parish the whole mission of the Church.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

18 Trustee(s)
50 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Surrey
Governance
- 02 February 2010: Previously excepted registration
- PCC OF ST NICOLAS (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
18 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Jill Sandham | Trustee | 17 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
John George Hutchinson | Trustee | 26 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Jonathan Neil-Smith | Trustee | 26 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Steven Reeds | Trustee | 26 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Wendy Gabriel | Trustee | 26 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Donald Alan Thompson | Trustee | 26 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Patrick Hardy Andrew | Trustee | 26 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Hilary Jean Fletcher | Trustee | 26 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Caroline Coleman | Trustee | 03 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Linda Sharpin | Trustee | 03 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Philip Timothy Thomas | Trustee | 03 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Rev Neil Charles Roberts | Trustee | 07 September 2021 |
|
|||||
David Richard Greenwood | Trustee | 18 October 2020 |
|
|||||
Darrol Radley | Trustee | 02 April 2017 |
|
|
||||
Andrew Rustell | Trustee | 13 March 2016 |
|
|
||||
Josephine Radley | Trustee | 13 March 2016 |
|
|||||
Catherine Anderson | Trustee | 22 March 2015 |
|
|
||||
PHILIP MATTHEW SIMON HOOPER | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £261.96k | £431.37k | £182.28k | £225.27k | £247.71k | |
|
Total expenditure | £345.93k | £238.07k | £221.71k | £209.06k | £251.81k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £1.20k | N/A | N/A | £1.00k | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 17 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 17 September 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 12 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 12 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 11 November 2022 | 11 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 11 November 2022 | 11 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 11 November 2021 | 11 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 11 November 2021 | 11 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 20 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 20 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL POWERS MEASURE (1956) AS AMENDED AND CHURCH REPRESENTATION RULES
Charitable objects
Promoting in the ecclesiastical parish the whole mission of the Church.
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, LOCAL
Contact information
- Address:
-
ST. NICOLAS CHURCH
THE PARISH OFFICE
BURY STREET
GUILDFORD
GU2 4AW
- Phone:
- 01483564526
- Email:
- parishoffice@saintnics.com
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window