THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST MAXENTIUS, BRADSHAW, WITHIN THE TURTON MOORLAND MINISTRY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
St Maxentius is the local Parish Church covering the Bradshaw area of Bolton. All monies raised are for the development and upkeep of our Church
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

17 Trustee(s)
37 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Bolton
Governance
- 06 November 2009: Previously excepted registration
- ST MAXENTIUS, BRADSHAW, BOLTON (Working name)
- ST MAXENTIUS, BRADSHAW, WITHIN THE TURTON MOORLAND MINISTRY (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
17 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Mark Pearson | Trustee | 15 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Samantha Dale | Trustee | 15 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Dr Matthew Pearson | Trustee | 15 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Katie Whittle | Trustee | 15 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
DAVID HOUGHTON | Trustee | 15 May 2022 |
|
|||||
Susan Usher | Trustee | 15 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Elaine Christian | Trustee | 21 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
BRYAN GOODALL | Trustee | 27 April 2015 |
|
|
||||
Joanne Haslam | Trustee | 21 April 2014 |
|
|
||||
Christine Sutcliffe | Trustee | 18 April 2014 |
|
|
||||
MR DON TAYLOR | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
ARTHUR GREAVES | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
JANET CHRISTINE BENNETT | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
ALISON GREAVES | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
NICOLA JANE WARING | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
Joyce Armstrong | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
CAROL LORRAINE CARR | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £73.55k | £71.94k | £66.00k | £89.49k | £70.69k | |
|
Total expenditure | £81.62k | £80.00k | £58.20k | £67.56k | £75.00k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 30 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 30 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 30 October 2024 | 365 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 30 October 2024 | 365 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 25 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 25 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 27 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 27 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 30 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 30 September 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL POWERS MEASURE (1956) AS AMENDED AND CHURCH REPRESENTATION RULES
Charitable objects
Promoting in the ecclesiastical parish the whole mission of the Church.
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, LOCAL.
Contact information
- Address:
-
677 TONGE MOOR ROAD
BOLTON
BL2 3BW
- Phone:
- 01204308461
- Email:
- clcarrbolt@talktalk.net
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window