THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST LUKE'S PRESTONVILLE. (DIOCESE OF CHICHESTER).

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To provide regular Sunday services of worship to the church members and the community of Prestonville, and pastoral and spiritual support, as well as various community service activities.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

16 Trustee(s)
20 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Brighton And Hove
Governance
- 28 January 2010: Previously excepted registration
- ST LUKE'S PRESTONVILLE (Working name)
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
16 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
MARTIN POOLE | Chair | 14 October 2011 |
|
|||||||||||
Richard David Simmons | Trustee | 19 May 2024 |
|
|
||||||||||
Mark Stephen John Jago | Trustee | 14 May 2023 |
|
|
||||||||||
June Madeleine Arnold | Trustee | 14 May 2023 |
|
|
||||||||||
Rev Elizabeth Karen Forbes Stone | Trustee | 14 May 2023 |
|
|||||||||||
Carolyn Olufunke Jikiemi-Roberts | Trustee | 15 May 2022 |
|
|
||||||||||
Wynefred Ann Savage | Trustee | 15 May 2022 |
|
|
||||||||||
Kathleen Margaret Hudson | Trustee | 15 May 2022 |
|
|
||||||||||
Judith Lucille Edge | Trustee | 15 May 2022 |
|
|
||||||||||
Caroline Johnson | Trustee | 11 October 2020 |
|
|
||||||||||
Dr Sarah Soppitt | Trustee | 28 April 2019 |
|
|
||||||||||
Dr Ronald James White | Trustee | 28 April 2019 |
|
|||||||||||
CHRISTINE CATON | Trustee | 29 April 2018 |
|
|||||||||||
Mark Watson | Trustee | 26 April 2015 |
|
|
||||||||||
Michele Scott White | Trustee | 22 October 2011 |
|
|||||||||||
SIR PETER WOODHEAD KCB | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £161.87k | £81.48k | £103.52k | £84.04k | £113.37k | |
|
Total expenditure | £88.38k | £144.82k | £104.64k | £86.16k | £112.59k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 14 June 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 14 June 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 25 May 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 25 May 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 09 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 09 June 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 06 July 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 06 July 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 03 November 2020 | 3 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 03 November 2020 | 3 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL POWERS MEASURE (1956) AS AMENDED AND CHURCH REPRESENTATION RULES
Charitable objects
Promoting in the ecclesiastical parish the whole mission of the Church.
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, LOCAL
Contact information
- Address:
-
ST. LUKES CHURCH
64 OLD SHOREHAM ROAD
BRIGHTON
BN1 5DD
- Phone:
- 01273557772
- Email:
- info@stlukesonline.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window